EUROPEAN SCOUT FEDERATION (BRITISH ASSOCIATION)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Outdoor Pursuits, Camping, Hiking, Swimming, Competitions and Service to Others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 December 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Gouldthorp | Chair | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Steel | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Thompson | Trustee | 09 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
TONY WARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.36k | £3.57k | £4.66k | £6.80k | £6.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.41k | £1.20k | £4.11k | £5.53k | £5.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH APRIL 1972 AS AMENDED ON 3RD OCTOBER 1976
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE OF BOTH SEXESIN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND SERVICE TO THE COMMUNITY AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS PRIMARY OBJECT AND AS ANCILLARY THERETO - (A) FOSTER COLLABORATION WITH SIMILAR GROUPS OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN EUROPE TOWARDS THE ATAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECT AND (B) FOLLOW A PRESCRIBED COURSE OF PROGRESSIVE TRAINING CALCULATED TO FURTHER THE PRIMARY OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 Pennway
Somersham
HUNTINGDON
Cambridgeshire
PE283JJ
- Phone:
- 07745 748098
- Email:
- info@fse-scouts.eu
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window