Accounts and annual returns LANGTON MATRAVERS LOCAL HISTORY AND PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 272407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2023 03 August 2024 181 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2022 03 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2021 29 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 Not Required