ENGLISH BICKNOR VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities for community activities for the residents of English Bicknor and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 18 March 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP GWILLIAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DAPHNE GWILLIAM | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Roy Waldron | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Shelbourn | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Watkins | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Entwistle | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.92k | £25.37k | £6.98k | £15.52k | £16.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.40k | £22.99k | £23.20k | £20.64k | £17.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 12TH FEBRUARY 1934 AS AMENDED ON 27 FEB 2023 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 FEB 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION AND SOCIAL, MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS, LIBRARY, LECTURES, CLASSES, RECREATION AND ENTERTAINMENTS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ENGLISH BICKNOR AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Seasons View
Larksfield Road
Harrow Hill
DRYBROOK
Gloucestershire
GL17 9JP
- Phone:
- 07708626825
- Email:
- ebvillagehall@outlook.com
- Website:
-
englishbicknor.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window