Financial history CHARDSTOCK COMMUNITY HALL TRUST

Charity number: 272433
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.45k £20.02k £39.74k £21.69k £18.80k
Total expenditure £27.91k £19.61k £22.37k £48.65k £15.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £250 £19.43k £11.99k N/A N/A