OUNDLE CHURCH CLOCK FUND

Charity Number: 272444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity is established for the purpose of maintaining, regulating and repairing as necessary the Clock in the Tower of the Parish Church at Oundle, Northamptonshire including the striking and chiming mechanism and the automatic winding gear.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £350
Total expenditure: £379

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 December 1976: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sian Fytche Chair 12 May 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OUNDLE WITH ASHTON
Received: On time
WILLIAM WALCOT'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Rev Stephen Jeremy Webster Trustee 24 February 2016
SIR WILLIAM LAXTON'S PENSION CHARITY
Received: On time
PARSON LATHAM'S HOSPITAL IN OUNDLE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OUNDLE WITH ASHTON
Received: On time
CHURCH LAND
Received: On time
WILLIAM WALCOT'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.54k £1.71k £1.79k £0 £350
Total expenditure £5.90k £1.44k £458 £287 £379
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
16 LAXTON DRIVE
OUNDLE
PETERBOROUGH
PE8 5TW
Phone:
01832275830