THE WINDSOR AND MAIDENHEAD ASSOCIATION FOR SOCIAL WORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WMCT makes grants to voluntary organisations which promote moral education, or assist people suffering ill-health, poverty, mental or physical distress or who are in need of support in dealing with personal relationships. Beneficiaries must live within the Royal Borough of Windsor & Maidenhead.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 15 December 1976: Standard registration
- WINDSOR & MAIDENHEAD CHRISTIAN TRUST (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACK PETER DOUGLAS | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Jeanette Margaret Lock | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
GREGORY JOHN O'BRIEN | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
SUSAN NORDBERG | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Susan Mary Savage | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
DOROTHY ANN STRACK-HANKEY | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
JAN MOSS | Trustee | 24 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||
MR MIKE MOSS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.11k | £19.18k | £18.32k | £18.32k | £20.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.14k | £13.50k | £33.46k | £33.46k | £29.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 November 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND OCTOBER 1976
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE MORAL IMPROVEMENT OF PERSONS IN THE NAME OF JESUS CHRIST WITHIN THE AREA OF THE RURAL DEANERY OF MAIDENHEAD AND THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES OF CRANBOURNE AND WINKFIELD BY:- (A) FURTHERING EDUCATION IN THE BASIC PRINCIPLES OF CHRISTIAN MORALITY (B) UNDERTAKING VOLUNTARY WORK IN EDUCATION, SOCIAL SERVICE AND SIMILAR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES, (C) WORKING FOR A HIGHER STANDARD OR MORAL LIFE (D) ASSISTING AND BEFRIENDING THOSE PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF DIFFICULTIES IN THEIR PERSONAL RELATIONSHIPS ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE AND MORAL GUIDANCE.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodstock
Boyn Hill Avenue
Maidenhead
SL6 4HA
- Phone:
- 01628673884
- Email:
- admin@wmct.info
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window