AKHAND KIRTANI JATHA U K

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR THE TEACHINGS OF GURU NANAK-GURU GOBIND SINGH AND THE ADI GURU GRANTH SAHIB (THE SIKH SCRIPTURES).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 December 1976: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 29 September 2009: Standard registration
- AKJ UK (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUJAR SINGH | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Lakhvir Singh | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daljit Singh Virk | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.07k | £5.22k | £5.04k | £3.78k | £7.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.72k | £6.86k | £0 | £3.88k | £2.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH NOVEMBER 1976
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR THE TEACHINGS OF GURU NANAK-GURU GOBIND SINGH AND THE ADI GURU GRANTH SAHIB (THE SIKH SCRIPTURES).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 princess street
Derby
DE23 8NT
- Phone:
- 07852393773
- Email:
- info@akj.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window