SAHAM TONEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We Have a large Hall for hire we can provide facilities for conferences, parties weddings etc and Smaller hall for smaller activities. Many local community groups use our hall for their activities, such as Art Groups,Dancing,Drop in coffee morning,Photography Club, Samsen Club for our senior residents to get together,Brownies,and Indoor Bowls Club. We also have a Post Office twice a week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 23 March 1979: Standard registration
- THE WELLS-COLE COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raechal Simpson Miss | Chair | 24 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neville Denman | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgie Church | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.74k | £45.70k | £15.87k | £37.92k | £32.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.18k | £14.23k | £10.97k | £26.08k | £15.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £500 | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 236 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 236 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 18 April 2023 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 18 April 2023 | 111 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 20 April 2022 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 17 November 2021 | 323 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 17 November 2021 | 323 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3RD OCTOBER 1978
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SAHAM TONEY AND IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SAHAM TONEY AND IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wells Cole Community Centre
Bell Lane
Saham Toney
Thetford
IP25 7HD
- Phone:
- 07927773133
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window