THE MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC CENTRE OF BRENT


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has issued an official warning Open in new window
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Activities: Education/Training Religious activities Provides buildings/facilities/open space
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Brent
Governance
- 22 December 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMAD SADEEQ | Chair |
|
||||||||
SAQIB JAMIL | Trustee | 10 February 2019 |
|
|||||||
Qaiser Chowdhry | Trustee | 10 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||
MOHAMMED NAJIB KHAN | Trustee | 05 July 2015 |
|
|||||||
Basharat Aslam | Trustee | 05 July 2015 |
|
|||||||
MOHAMMAD HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MOHAMMAD HUKUM DAD UL-QADRI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £276.13k | £263.63k | £303.70k | £385.05k | £426.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £255.94k | £220.71k | £198.72k | £308.78k | £326.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £46.60k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 October 2024 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 15 October 2024 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 February 2024 | 201 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 16 February 2024 | 201 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 August 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 17 August 2022 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND REGULATIONS ADOPTED 4TH JULY 1976 AS AMENDED 24TH OCTOBER 1976, 1ST APRIL 1978 AND 2ND OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
SA) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND ODCTRINE OF HOLY QUR'AN AND SUNNAH. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF MUSLIM CHILDREN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINE OF ISLAM. C)THE RELIEF OF SUCH MUSLIMS WHO ARE POOR AND NEEDY.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF BRENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 HOWARD ROAD
LONDON
NW2 6DS
- Phone:
- 02084501986
- Email:
- brentmosque@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window