THE BURGES SALMON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes, making grants to local organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 22 December 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alice Margaret Honeywill | Chair | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm James Robert Donald | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rohan Campbell | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth de Maid | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Louise Usher-Clark | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Robert Morley Hewitt | Trustee | 15 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GEORGE HOULDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.60k | £107.79k | £78.97k | £74.01k | £77.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.85k | £82.91k | £83.28k | £75.73k | £73.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28TH OCTOBER 1976 AS AMENDED BY ORDER OF 17 JANUARY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 16 APR 2020
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME THEREOF AND SUCH PART OF THE CAPITAL THEREOF AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT TO SUCH INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS (WHETHER CORPORATE OR UNINCORPORATE) RECOGNIZED BY THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES OR SCOTLAND AS CHARITABLE FOR ANY PURPOSES RECOGNIZED BY THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME SELECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BURGES SALMON LLP
1 GLASS WHARF
BRISTOL
BS2 0ZX
- Phone:
- 01179022731
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window