Trustees THE BURGES SALMON CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 272522

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alice Margaret Honeywill | Chair | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm James Robert Donald | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rohan Campbell | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth de Maid | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Louise Usher-Clark | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Robert Morley Hewitt | Trustee | 15 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GEORGE HOULDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.