THE RC SHERRIFF ROSEBRIARS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE TRUST DEVELOPS, PROMOTES AND SUPPORTS AMATEUR AND PROFESSIONAL ARTS IN THE BOROUGH OF ELMBRIDGE, THROUGHAWARDING GRANT AID TO LOCAL ARTISTS, ARTS ORGANISATIONS, VENUES AND PROJECTS; ORGANISING AND DIRECTLY MANAGING ARTS INITIATIVES; PUBLISHING AND DISTRIBUTING A FREE QUARTERLY LISTINGS MAGAZINE, ÔÇ£ARTS FOCUSÔÇØ; OFFERING ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO THE ARTS COMMUNITY AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £5,572 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 15 December 1976: Standard registration
- THE R C SHERRIFF TRUST (Working name)
- "ROSEBRIARS" IN CONNEXION WITH ELMBRIDGE BOROUGH COUNCIL (Previous name)
- "THE ROSEBRIARS TRUST" IN CONNEXION WITH ELMBRIDGE BOROUGH COUNCIL (Previous name)
- THE ROSEBRIARS TRUST IN CONNEXION WITH ELMBRIDGE BOROUGH COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barry Cheyne | Chair |
|
||||||
Janet Turner | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jean Latter | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tricia Welch Bland | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Karen Randolph | Trustee | 21 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN NATHAN | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
WENDY SMITHERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES ARTHUR VICKERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TANNIA SHIPLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
SHWETA KAPADIA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £199.88k | £182.06k | £157.43k | £140.79k | £146.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £223.49k | £167.59k | £160.86k | £167.66k | £182.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.34k | £22.25k | £3.78k | £4.37k | £5.57k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED WITH THREE CODICILS THERETO AT THE PRINCIPAL REGISTRY ON 10 FEBRUARY 1976, AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 23 AUGUST 1993, AND 18 AUGUST 2004 AND BY RESOLUTION DATED 27TH JANUARY 2009 as amended on 27 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF ELMBRIDGE AS IT THINKS FIT.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF ELMBRIDGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 111, 1st Floor
Ashley Park House
Walton on Thames
Surrey
KT12 1RZ
- Phone:
- 01932229996
- Email:
- arts@rcsherrifftrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window