SOUTHEND AND DISTRICT HOSPITAL RADIO SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a radio service to patients of Southend University Hospital
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 15 December 1976: Standard registration
- SOUTHEND HOSPITAL RADIO (Working name)
- SOUTHEND HOSPITAL RADIO CHARITY FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joseph Smith | Chair | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Raymond Bennett | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Keith Byford | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Brian Dorking | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles William Palmer | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Archer | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE MAUREEN MULLAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER DENNIS SIPPLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.75k | £2.97k | £3.19k | £267 | £2.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.74k | £2.64k | £2.97k | £4.12k | £4.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 November 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH JUNE 1976, AS AMENDED ON THE 21ST JANUARY 1986 AND 27 MARCH 2007 as amended on 13 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, INFIRMITY AND OLD AGE AMONGST PERSONS LIVING IN SOUTHEND AND DISTRICT BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR SOUTHEND HOSPITAL AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF SOUTHEND-ON-SEA AND A RADIUS OF TWENTY MILES THEREFROM.
Area of benefit
SOUTHEND BOROUGH AND A RADIUS OF TWENTY MILES THEREFROM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rear of Southend Hospital
Prittlewell Chase
WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA
Essex
SS0 0RY
- Phone:
- 01702338181
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window