ENGLISH SPEAKING BOARD (INTERNATIONAL) LIMITED

Charity Number: 272565
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The English Speaking Board as a charitable organisation has a mission to promote clear, effective oral communication at all levels by providing high quality assessments, training and services in the UK and overseas, recognising and encouraging the potential of all. In planning their activities the Trustees have kept in mind the charity commissioners' guidance on public benefit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 December 1976: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • E S B (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sami Mirza Chair 24 July 2023
ACIS GROUP LIMITED
Received: On time
Edward Paul Stanley May Trustee 13 January 2025
ACIS GROUP LIMITED
Received: On time
Joanna Jarjue Trustee 21 September 2023
None on record
Damian Low Trustee 21 September 2023
None on record
Jason Paul Vit Trustee 21 September 2023
None on record
Dr James McAtear Trustee 21 September 2023
None on record
Daniel Brown Trustee 02 October 2021
None on record
Frances Deirdre Richardson Trustee 19 August 2020
None on record
Simren Priestley Trustee 19 August 2020
None on record
Stephen William Spencer Norton Trustee 19 August 2020
NORTH SURREY GROUP SCOPE
Received: On time
ENHANCEABLE
Received: On time
VILLIERS PARK EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
DEAF UNITY
Received: On time
GOLDSMITHS STUDENTS' UNION
Received: 75 days late
SPEAKERS' CORNER TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.12m £1.38m £1.67m £1.45m £1.49m
Total expenditure £1.93m £1.51m £1.73m £1.74m £1.67m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £88.96k £5.01k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £547 £235 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.12m £1.38m £1.67m £1.43m £1.46m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.74k £224 £248 £16.97k £27.54k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.93m £1.51m £1.73m £1.74m £1.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £2.49k £2.50k
Expenditure - Governance £10.90k £5.70k £10.56k £7.18k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £2.49k £2.50k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Own use assets £324.41k £305.98k £295.11k £289.09k £286.46k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £493.51k £515.53k
Other assets £1.88m £1.66m £1.58m £777.47k £593.79k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £212.29k £103.83k £86.65k £66.38k £64.01k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 23 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 23 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 19 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 24 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 24 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 22 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 23 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 Hattersley Court
Burscough Road
Ormskirk
L39 2AY
Phone:
07736469310