EBENEZER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees support churches and other charitable bodies, mainly those involved with the promotion and spreading of the Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 22 December 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Thomas Davey | Chair | 22 August 1976 |
|
|||||||
RUTH MARY DAVEY | Trustee | 22 August 1976 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.78k | £54.67k | £360.87k | £85.14k | £69.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.77k | £96.24k | £389.84k | £75.66k | £74.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22ND AUGUST 1976
Charitable objects
THE SUPPORT BY CONTRIBUTION, LOAN, GIFT OR SUBSCRIPTION OF ANY RELIGIOUS OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTION WHICH IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE PROTESTANT AND EVANGELICAL TENETS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF MISSIONARY ACTIVITY DESIGNED FOR THE SPREAD OF SUCH FAITH. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE GOVERNING INSTRUMENT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
LONGWOOD LODGE
WHITES HILL
STOCK
INGATESTONE
CM4 9QB
- Phone:
- 01277829893
- Email:
- nigel.davey@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window