THE SISTERS OF THE INFANT JESUS (NICOLAS BARRE) GENERAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of religious and other charitable work including education, parish and ministry work, family support, care for the elderly and support of missions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Ireland
Governance
- 20 January 1977: Standard registration
- THE SISTERS OF THE HOLY INFANT JESUS GENERAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sister Marie Catherine Pitcher | Chair | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sister Margaret Philomena Walsh | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
SISTER ROSEMARY BARTER | Trustee | 08 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £207.21k | £270.85k | £434.33k | £302.73k | £486.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.99k | £134.58k | £158.22k | £427.93k | £222.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 MARCH 1975 VARIED BY DEEDS DATED 14 MAY 1981, 4 MARCH 1982, 5 FEBRUARY 1993, 9 MARCH 1993 AND 26 JUNE 1998
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED ON IN ENGLAND AND WALES OR ELSEWHERE, BY OR UNDER THE DIRECTION OR WITH THE SUPPORT OF THE SOCIETY AS THE TRUSTEES, WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE PROVINCIAL SUPERIOR SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF DEED)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Adams Hill
Bartley Green
Birmingham
B32 3QG
- Phone:
- 0035318186860
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window