LANDPORT ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND PARENTS' ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 06 January 1977: Standard registration
- 15 January 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH OCTOBER 1976
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT AND AUGMENT THE WORK OF THE PORTSMOUTH CITY COUNCIL IN MAINTAINING A COMPREHENSIVE PLAY AREA AT LANDPORT ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND, ARUNDEL STREET, LANDPORT, SUCH FACILITIES BEING PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE CHILDREN OF LANDPORT.
Area of benefit
PORTSMOUTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window