Trustees THE NEWSTEAD WOOD PARENTS' ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 272614

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAJEN KANDEL | Chair | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Arindam Chaudhuri | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kapil Tejram Trivedi | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Bredemear | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
LOLA ENAPE | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
XINYUN WANG | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Syed Abdul Razzak Hussain | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.