Financial history THE RADNOR CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 272634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £8.13k £6.03k £7.24k £8.35k £8.99k
Total expenditure £9.26k £8.01k £6.24k £11.11k £9.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A