THE GREEN HOWARDS REGIMENTAL MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Upholding the tradition of the Green Howards through the running of a museum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 20 January 1977: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Green Howards Trust Sole Corporate Trust | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6TH DECEMBER 1976 AND ORDER OF 15 AUGUST 2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION OF 7/10/06 AND RESOLUTION OF 25/10/08 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
UPHOLDING THE TRADITONS OF THE REGIMENT AND OF PERPETUATING ITS DEEDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
R H Q THE GREEN HOWARDS &
REGIMENTAL MUSEUM
TRINITY CHURCH SQUARE
RICHMOND
NORTH YORKSHIRE
DL10 4QN
- Phone:
- 01748826561
- Email:
- director@greenhowards.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window