ESPERANTO-ASOCIO DE BRITIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting awareness of the international language Esperanto to the public. Running courses, providing support to students of Esperanto, and encouraging participation in international Esperanto events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 February 1977: Standard registration
- 18 October 2021: Funds received from 313190 THE NORWICH JUBILEE ESPERANTO FOUNDATION
- EAB (Working name)
- ESPERANTO ASSOCIATION OF BRITAIN (Working name)
- ESPERANTO CENTRE (Working name)
- ESPERANTO OFFICE (Working name)
- ESPERANTO TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- ESPERANTO-GB (Working name)
- ESPERANTO-UK (Working name)
- GROUP FIVE (Working name)
- ESPERANTO-ASOCIO DE BRITUJO (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLARE HUNTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Robert Garcia | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gabriel Beecham | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Greenwood | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.54k | £670.31k | £145.58k | £137.46k | £130.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.10k | £98.28k | £116.38k | £115.44k | £97.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £557.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £24.74k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £87.76k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £98.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £15.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 06 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 06 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/03/1976 AS AMENDED ON 03/04/1983 AS AMENDED ON 04/05/1997 AS AMENDED ON 01/05/2004 AS AMENDED ON 16/05/2010 AS AMENDED ON 21/09/2013 as amended on 18 May 2018 as amended on 05 May 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND ABOUT THE INTERNATIONAL LANGUAGE ESPERANTO AND TO PRESERVE AND PROMOTE THE CULTURE AND HERITAGE OF ESPERANTO FOR THE EDUCATIONAL BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Esperanto-Asocio de Britio
483 Green Lanes
London
N13 4BS
- Phone:
- 07546 590 651
- Email:
- eab@esperanto.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window