Financial history NORTH CRAWLEY COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity Number: 272678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £21.18k £17.85k £19.61k £30.92k £20.00k
Total expenditure £20.52k £11.28k £10.75k £34.73k £10.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.00k £9.43k £2.67k £7.55k N/A