Financial history E M S ABRAHAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 272705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £64.82k £33.60k £86.45k £87.49k £64.28k
Total expenditure £47.89k £38.15k £6.86k £64.90k £15.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A