EASTRY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Village Hall offers a venue for all types of activities,ranging from WI ,horticultutural ,all hobbies ,anything. All ages, it has a creche type facility. Anyone in the village can hire it for events . Theatre groups ,painting classes. Its a meeting place for all ages ,and much used
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 25 January 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Wheatley | Chair | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Tomlinson | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Stanford | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Dundas | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Long | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jan Smart | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hankins | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Bull | Trustee | 05 May 2017 |
|
|||||
ANDREW ROBERT BARWICK | Trustee | 24 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA MARGARET BURTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBIN EDWARD BISHOP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.30k | £26.65k | £25.41k | £27.43k | £23.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.13k | £11.37k | £24.05k | £23.79k | £20.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.07k | £12.00k | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 July 2024 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 July 2024 | 155 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 30TH NOVEMBER 1933
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION AND MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS, LIBRARY, LECTURES, CLASSES, RECREATIONS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF EASTRY AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF EASTRY AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Peak Drive
Eastry
SANDWICH
Kent
CT13 0DY
- Phone:
- 07718587956
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window