Accounts and annual returns JUDITH KLEEMAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 272751
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2011 16 November 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 16 November 2011 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2010 27 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2009 03 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not Required