Financial history GLOUCESTERSHIRE ISLAMIC TRUST

Charity number: 272760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £57.50k £62.01k £93.14k £119.51k £110.75k
Total expenditure £98.22k £51.65k £43.89k £51.80k £66.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A