The Grinstead Music Fund

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides grants towards the purchase of musical instruments or the payment for lessons or other educational or training facilities for musicians under the age of 26 years who are living or studying in the London Borough of Croydon, or who have previously attended secondary education in Croydon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Croydon
Governance
- 27 January 1977: Standard registration
- THE DOROTHY GRINSTEAD MEMORIAL FUND (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRONIA JOAN PARRY BMus LGSM | Chair | 20 September 2004 |
|
|
||||||||
Sarah Newlands | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Bethany Norman | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Jennifer Ruth Brady BA MA | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Mark Rogers B Mus MBA | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
JONATHAN DOUGLAS REGAN | Trustee | 08 October 2015 |
|
|||||||||
MR D WILCOX BEd LTCL LVCM FRSA | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Carl Anthony Jackson | Trustee | 26 September 1994 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.53k | £2.76k | £3.16k | £3.49k | £3.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.75k | £4.01k | £3.27k | £3.78k | £3.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 April 2023 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10TH JANUARY 1977 as amended on 09 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF MUSICAL EDUCATION OR FOR SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
81 Haydn Avenue
PURLEY
CR8 4AJ
- Phone:
- 02086810909
- Email:
- jon.regan@croydon.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window