Governing document HELP THE AGED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 JUNE 1976 AS AMENDED 26 NOVEMBER 1976, 12 JANUARY 1977, 27 NOVEMBER 2001, 4 APRIL 2002, 21 SEPTEMBER 2004, 19 SEPTEMBER 2006 AND 18 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED TO BE CHARITABLE BY LAW IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND FOR SUCH OTHER ANCILLARY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE AND IN RELATION TO ANY OF SUCH OBJECTS TO FOLLOW THE CHRISTIAN INJUNCTIONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.