Trustees CYCLING HISTORY AND EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 272792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR N ODDY Chair
None on record
Paul Arnold Trustee 27 October 2023
None on record
Gerd Michael Gruetzner Trustee 02 June 2023
None on record
Dr ANDREW MILLWARD Trustee 13 January 2023
THE BIRMINGHAM CHORAL UNION
Received: On time
NATIONAL CYCLE MUSEUM
Received: On time
Dr BOB DAMPER Trustee 31 May 2022
None on record
RAYMOND PASCOE Trustee 15 October 2021
None on record
Dr Sheila Catherine Hanlon Trustee 16 November 2018
None on record
CARLTON REID Trustee 16 November 2018
None on record