THAXTED WINDMILL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A GRADE TWO LISTED WINDMILL OPEN TO THE PUBLIC WITH A RURAL MUSEUM
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income includes £7,250 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 10 February 1977: Standard registration
- 29 November 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 29 November 2023: Funds transferred to 1199545 THAXTED WINDMILL TRUST CIO
- JOHN WEBBS WINDMILL (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.00k | £366 | £17.90k | £29.40k | £16.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.48k | £3.49k | £14.78k | £23.66k | £20.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £16.63k | £6.57k | £7.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 16 DECEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 10 AUGUST 1999.
Charitable objects
(A) TO SECURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE RESTORATION PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THAXTED WINDMILL AS A BUILDING OF ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE. (B) TO USE PART OF THE WINDMILL AS A PERMANENT AGRICULTURAL MUSEUM. (C) TO ACQUIRE AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENTS FOR DISPLAY IN THE MUSEUM.
Area of benefit
THAXTED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window