THE GREENWICH TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 272811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Association now produces news and information from around the Royal Borough of Greenwich on weekly memory sticks. This free service is carried out entirely by volunteers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £111
Total expenditure: £1,463

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Greenwich

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 February 1977: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARGARET EVELYN TAYLOR Chair
ELIZABETH LEGATT FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Angela Cornforth Trustee 03 July 2023
None on record
ROGER MEDHURST Trustee 10 July 2017
None on record
ALAN PATIENT Trustee 21 January 2013
None on record
MARION KENNETT Trustee
None on record
DELLA LILY JILL PRETTY Trustee
None on record
David Crafter Trustee
THOMAS PHILIPOT'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SWIMMING CLUBS FOR THE HANDICAPPED (N A S C H )
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £127 £127 £1.20k £323 £111
Total expenditure £1.46k £1.46k £323 £1.40k £1.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 May 2024 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 February 2023 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
26 STRONGBOW ROAD
LONDON
SE9 1DT
Phone:
02088595671
Website:

No information available