Accounts and annual returns THE INTERNATIONAL FELLOWSHIP FOR CHRIST
Charity Number: 272823

Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 July 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 21 July 2024 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 April 2024 | 332 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 07 December 2023 | 190 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 07 July 2023 | 402 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 07 July 2023 | 402 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 July 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 July 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 10 July 2020 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 10 July 2020 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window