THE INTERNATIONAL FELLOWSHIP FOR CHRIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
-PREACH THE GOSPEL -TEACH THE WORD OF GOD -OPEN BRANCHES -ORDAIN MINISTER TO DO THE CHRISTIAN WORK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 July 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR BAXTER | Chair |
|
||||||
REV RUBELL MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORMA GRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.23k | £31.86k | £36.34k | £38.82k | £45.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.52k | £28.51k | £24.49k | £34.65k | £89.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 July 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 21 July 2024 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 April 2024 | 332 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 07 December 2023 | 190 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 07 July 2023 | 402 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 07 July 2023 | 402 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 July 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 July 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 10 July 2020 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 10 July 2020 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH MAY 1978
Charitable objects
A) TO PRESENT THE CHRISTIAN MESSAGE AND WAY OF LIFE, TO WIN PEOPLE FOR JESIS CHRIST AND TO INTRODUCE THEM TO THE FELLOWSHIP OF CHRIST. B) TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GRO TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
IFC
213A RAILTON ROAD
LONDON
SE24 0LX
- Phone:
- 02072748269
- Email:
- akumiah51@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window