Financial history EASTON-ON-THE-HILL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 272834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £9.67k £20.15k £13.91k £11.54k £12.84k
Total expenditure £12.92k £4.54k £8.33k £9.35k £22.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.67k £8.00k N/A £5.00k