CHARITY OF LYDIA FLORENCE JELLICOE

Charity number: 272854
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grants are provided to persons of the Christian faith who are in need, distress etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £2,785
Total expenditure: £15,755

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 April 1977: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Brian Chapman Chair 06 September 2011
DORSET POSTAL BIBLE SCHOOL
Received: On time
CHRISTIAN WORKERS RELIEF FUND
Received: On time
CHAPMAN TRUST
Received: On time
DR S S SHORT CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Timothy Huw Bennett Trustee 18 October 2023
CHRISTIAN WORKERS RELIEF FUND
Received: On time
RACHEL CLARA DAWS Trustee 09 October 2018
CHRISTIAN WORKERS RELIEF FUND
Received: On time
DR S S SHORT CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
DAME VIOLET WILLS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
ANDREW ANTHONY HOWARD BARNES Trustee 10 March 2016
CHRISTIAN WORKERS RELIEF FUND
Received: On time
JOHN GAMBLE Trustee 10 October 2013
STEWARDS COMPANY LTD
Received: On time
CHRISTIAN WORKERS RELIEF FUND
Received: On time
STEWART ALAN SIMMONS Trustee 06 September 2011
WESTERN COUNTIES & SOUTH WALES EVANGELISATION TRUST
Recently registered
CHRISTIAN WORKERS RELIEF FUND
Received: On time
WESTERN COUNTIES AND SOUTH WALES EVANGELIZATION TRUST
Received: On time
ETLOE EVANGELICAL CHURCH
Received: On time
MICHAEL PEACH Trustee 06 September 2011
CHRISTIAN WORKERS RELIEF FUND
Received: On time
HAROLD JOHN LEE BSC Trustee 06 September 2011
GOSPEL BROADCASTING IN PORTUGUESE
Received: On time
Appleyards Bible Church
Received: On time
BOURNEMOUTH WESTMINSTER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
CHRISTIAN WORKERS RELIEF FUND
Received: On time
EMMANUEL CHAPEL TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.33k £4.31k £4.17k £2.74k £2.79k
Total expenditure £27.65k £27.51k £30.01k £34.77k £15.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 Inglewood Drive
BOGNOR REGIS
West Sussex
PO21 4JX
Phone:
01243 263966
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available