STANWAY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
There are three parts to the village hall together with changing rooms for the adjacent playing fields. Activities that are undertaken in the hall are - carpet bowls, mother & toddler groups, children's play & dance groups, dog training, private hire, flower clubs, ladies groups, keep fit, weight watchers, war games. training, singing groups, art clubs etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 10 February 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Longman | Chair | 12 March 2001 |
|
|
||||
Ann Laura Norton | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
TERESA DIANE BAINES | Trustee | 01 October 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.38k | £55.02k | £79.29k | £79.82k | £87.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.98k | £61.54k | £67.04k | £86.10k | £89.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 January 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 January 2024 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 December 2023 | 417 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 December 2023 | 417 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 December 2023 | 775 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 December 2023 | 775 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 November 2023 | 1119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 November 2023 | 1119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 15TH MAY 1972
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF STANWAY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATIONS AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STANWAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stanway Village Hall
Villa Road
Stanway
COLCHESTER
CO3 0RH
- Phone:
- 01206 545062
- Website:
-
stanwaycommunitycentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window