Accounts and annual returns CLAPHAM (BEDFORD) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 272861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 February 2024 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 November 2022 297 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 March 2022 413 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required