CRINGLEFORD SCHOOL PARENT AND TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To develop extended relationships between the staff parents and others associated with Cringleford School. Engage in activites which support the school and advance the education of the pupils attending it. Provide and assist in the provision of such facilites or items for education at the school as the Committee in consultation with the head and the Governing Body see fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
Governance
- 10 February 1977: Standard registration
- CRINGLEFORD PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS' AND TEACHERS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy Edye | Chair | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alice Collins | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Cott | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Lee | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Burrell | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Bradley | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Osborne | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.62k | £8.40k | £2.47k | £8.31k | £4.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.18k | £22.23k | £4.68k | £7.82k | £878 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 31 August 2020 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31ST AUGUST 1976, AS AMENDED 8TH OCTOBER 1979 AND 20 SEPTEMBER 1994. AS AMENDED ON 28 FEB 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
CRINGLEFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cringleford Primary School
80-88 Dragonfly Lane
Cringleford
NORWICH
NR4 7JR
- Phone:
- 01603458060
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window