Financial history THE ARMSTRONG HALL, THORNBURY

Charity number: 272883
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £185.33k £109.11k £3.52k £31.31k £51.08k
Total expenditure £200.65k £67.54k £13.67k £40.08k £24.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £112.39k £105.00k N/A £25.93k £34.07k