THE ARMSTRONG HALL, THORNBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the use of the Armstrong Hall in the interests of social welfare for use as a public hall, community and recreation centre with ancillary uses for the recreation and leisure time, occupation of the inhabitants of Thornbury and the neighbourhood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £34,071 from 1 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 16 March 1977: Standard registration
- 03 May 2017: Funds received from 1120422 ARTS AND COMMUNITY IN THORNBURY LTD
- ARMSTRONG HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THORNBURY TOWN COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £185.33k | £109.11k | £3.52k | £31.31k | £51.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £200.65k | £67.54k | £13.67k | £40.08k | £24.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £112.39k | £105.00k | N/A | £25.93k | £34.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 March 2025 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 March 2025 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF DECLARATION DATED 19TH JANUARY 1977 AND SCHEME DATED 29 NOVEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
FOR USE AS A PUBLIC HALL OR HALLS COMMUNITY AND RECREATION CENTRE AND ANCILLARY USES FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF THORNBURY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THORNBURY AND THE NEIGHBOUR-HOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
TOWN HALL
OLD POLICE STATION
HIGH STREET
THORNBURY
SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE
BS35 2AR
- Phone:
- 01454446872
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window