Financial history OVERSEAS FELLOWSHIP OF NIGERIAN CHRISTIANS (OFNC)

Charity number: 272885
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £213.96k £211.89k £481.24k £251.98k £295.95k
Total expenditure £271.98k £202.99k £256.34k £250.41k £248.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A