Accounts and annual returns BRIDPORT COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 272887
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2017 01 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 08 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required