Financial history BREWHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 272890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £83.35k £22.62k £164.21k £22.93k £5.94k
Total expenditure £114.42k £24.50k £176.89k £17.22k £7.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.51k £10.67k N/A N/A N/A