BREWHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDES VILLAGE HALL FOR HIRE TO ALL GROUPS IN BREWHAM AND SURROUNDING AREA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 22 February 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liza Greaves | Chair | 17 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Shields | Trustee | 27 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Coward | Trustee | 18 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
James Coward | Trustee | 18 November 2013 |
|
|||||
MRS M CASTLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS K COOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR E HARPER MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.35k | £22.62k | £164.21k | £22.93k | £5.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.42k | £24.50k | £176.89k | £17.22k | £7.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.51k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 April 2024 | 294 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 April 2024 | 294 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 August 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST OCTOBER 1968
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORTH AND SOUTH BREWHAM, AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
NORTH AND SOUTH BREWHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 FAIRVIEW
NORTH BREWHAM
BRUTON
BA10 0JT
- Phone:
- 01749850034
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window