THE HENRIETTA BARNETT SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It is a charity devoted to advance the education of pupils at the school by providing or assisting in the provision of facilities for education at the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnet
Governance
- 03 March 1977: Standard registration
- H B S P T A (Working name)
- THE PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION OF THE HENRIETTA BARNETT SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vibhor Narang | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Surabhi Gupta | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruchira Poddar | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nadia Adil | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aparna Tatavarty | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.70k | £9.54k | £382 | £25.93k | £32.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.03k | £578 | £283 | £19.79k | £24.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 118 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION (REVISED UP TO JUNE 1974)
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL AND FOR THE FUTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL AND MAY ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE WELFARE OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET
Contact information
- Address:
-
HENRIETTA BARNETT SCHOOL
CENTRAL SQUARE
LONDON
NW11 7BN
- Phone:
- 02084588999
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window