Accounts and annual returns THE UNIVERSITY OF THE WEST OF ENGLAND BRISTOL CHAPLAINCY CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 272925
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2018 20 May 2019 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 11 April 2018 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 10 February 2017 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required