Financial history THE UNIVERSITY OF THE WEST OF ENGLAND BRISTOL CHAPLAINCY CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 272925
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018
Total gross income £70 £216 £43 £73 £55
Total expenditure £3.31k £313 £307 £317 £332
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A