CAVERSHAM PARK VILLAGE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our area of benefit is Caversham Park Village in Reading and neighbouring parts of Berkshire and South Oxfordshire. We exist to improve the condition of life for all inhabitants by establishing, maintaining and managing a Community Centre and by advancing education and providing facilities for recreation and leisure time activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Reading
Governance
- 14 March 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rakesh Bhandari | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil David Tayler | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Brackley | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Weiss | Trustee | 20 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Sturgess | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.43k | £84.89k | £108.03k | £107.68k | £109.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.96k | £149.82k | £113.25k | £150.36k | £120.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 November 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 22 November 2024 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 12 October 2024 | 408 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 12 October 2024 | 408 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 06 February 2024 | 524 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 06 February 2024 | 524 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 31 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 31 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 03 September 2020 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 03 September 2020 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JUNE 1967 AS AMENDED ON 12 FEBRUARY 1976, 19 JANUARY 1981, 25 FEBRUARY 1985, 20 JANUARY 1997 AND 25 FEBRUARY 2002
Charitable objects
A. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CAVERSHAM PARK VILLAGE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B. ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
CAVERSHAM PARK VILLAGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Milestone Centre
Milestone Way
Caversham
Reading
RG4 6PF
- Phone:
- 01183341040
- Email:
- office@cpva.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window