Financial history MILLBROOK VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 272971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.46k £10.73k £19.82k £23.35k £23.03k
Total expenditure £20.88k £7.67k £14.06k £21.04k £25.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A