MILLBROOK VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of Milbrook Village Hall for the use of Millbrook residents and others in the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 01 March 1977: Standard registration
- MILLBROOK VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alyson Smith | Chair | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Wright | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Wright | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clair Drury | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Baldry | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heather Edwards | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stokoe | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANICE WRIGHT | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
THERESA EVAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIA SHAYLER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.46k | £10.73k | £19.82k | £23.35k | £23.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.88k | £7.67k | £14.06k | £21.04k | £25.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE OF 31 DECEMBER 1959
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF MILLBROOK AND NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION.
Area of benefit
MILLBROOK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ELIZABETHAN COTTAGE
MILLBROOK
BEDFORD
MK45 2JB
- Phone:
- 01525213549
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window